+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 917).
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Moriwaki Co-Chair; J.Keohokalole, Ruderman, Fevella.
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 738) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1990) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele.
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-19 10:20AM in conference room 211.
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1393) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara.
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to CPH, WAM.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 186).
- Passed First Reading.
- Referred to CPH/HMS, WAM.
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1003), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd.
On February 16, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
- Reported from HSH/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 677) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura.
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura.
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-14-19 8:30AM in conference room 329.
- The committee(s) on HSH/HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-14-19 at 8:30 AM.
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-12-19 11:00AM in conference room 329.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HSH/HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-12-19 at 11:00AM.
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HSH/HLT on Wednesday, 02-06-19 9:15AM in House conference room 329.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HSH/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor