+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Rhoads voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Pouha excused (1).
- Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 271), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Aquino, Choy, Ichiyama, Ing, Kong, LoPresti, Say, Tsuji, Matsumoto, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ito.
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Monday, 02-02-15 2:00PM in House conference room 309.
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 1
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor