+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM/WTL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 261).
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Fukumoto, Matsumoto, Yamane voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-17.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1028) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Gates, Tupola.
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-28-17 3:02PM in conference room 308.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Tuesday, 02-28-17.
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-23-17 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) McKelvey, San Buenaventura, Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fukumoto, Lowen, Matsumoto, Yamane voting no (4) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
- Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 595) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, LoPresti, Creagan, Gates, Ing, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite.
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-16-17 11:30AM in conference room 312.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- The committee(s) on PBS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-16-17.
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 02-09-17 10:00AM in House conference room 312.
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to PBS, FIN, referral sheet 2
- Pass First Reading
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.