+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4).
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Deferred one day 02-13-19.
- Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 285), recommending referral to FIN.
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Hashem, Matayoshi, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 02-08-19 10:00AM in House conference room 423.
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on TRN with Representative(s) Wildberger voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1).
- Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 4) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to TRN.
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Lowen, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Wildberger; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Thielen.
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Friday, 01-25-19 10:35AM in House conference room 423.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to WLH, TRN, FIN, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor