+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (55)
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Act 033, 05/13/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1134).
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Act 033, on 05/13/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1134).
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 150).
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 150) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, K. Rhoads, Dela Cruz, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, C. Lee, Gates, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 2:05PM in conference room 016.
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-25-19 4:55PM in conference room 016.
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 917).
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; K. Rhoads, Dela Cruz Co-Chairs; Harimoto, Fevella.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Takayama, C. Lee, Gates Co-Chairs; McDermott.
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 735) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2050) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye.
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-05-19 10:25AM in conference room 211.
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from PSM/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1406) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella.
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Fevella.
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 10:30AM in conference room 016.
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to PSM/JDC, WAM.
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-12-19 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-19 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 182).
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1125), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto.
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-26-19 1:30PM in House conference room 308.
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 761) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-14-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-14-19.
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 02-13-19 3:00PM in House conference room 325.
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3).
- Reported from PVM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 207) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Nishimoto, Ohno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by PVM on Wednesday, 02-06-19 10:00AM in House conference room 430.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to PVM, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.