+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to PSM, JDC.
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL.
- Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 961) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL.
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-17 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM, JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 259).
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 800) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Oshiro, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-24-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Re-referred to JUD, referral sheet 20
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, JUD, referral sheet 2
- Pass First Reading
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor