+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
- Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1004) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL.
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran.
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-15 1:45PM in conference room 229.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM, JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 189).
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Pouha, Tupola, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Jordan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-15.
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 747) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima, Woodson, McDermott.
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-26-15 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-26-15 at 2:00 PM in room 325.
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-24-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) McDermott voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Pouha excused (1).
- Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 320), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Yamashita, Aquino, Ichiyama, Johanson, Keohokalole, San Buenaventura, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Nakashima, Tupola.
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 02-12-15 9:00AM in House conference room 309.
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to PBS, JUD, referral sheet 1
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor