+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-15-17 8:40AM in House conference room 312.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Re-referred to AGR, JUD, referral sheet 15
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to EEP/AGR, JUD, referral sheet 2
- Pass First Reading
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor