+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-27-13 3:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-27-13.
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-25-13 2:30PM in House conference room 325.
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6).
- Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 450) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Thielen, Cullen, Evans, Hanohano, Kawakami, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Coffman; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-12-13 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor