+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
- Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 616) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, Gates, Creagan, LoPresti, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) DeCoite, Takayama; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Tuesday, 02-14-17 8:30AM in House conference room 312.
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to OMH, JUD, referral sheet 2
- Pass First Reading
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor