+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 966) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara.
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-13 10:30AM in conference room 016.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL, WAM.
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 24).
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 586), recommending passage on Third Reading.
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Say voting no (1) and Representative(s) Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Nishimoto excused (6). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-13-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Say excused (2).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 142) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Hashem, Aquino, Ichiyama, Ing, Takumi, Yamashita, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane.
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 01-29-13 9:00AM in House conference room 309.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor