+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (49)
On July 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Vetoed on 07-09-19 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1373).
On July 9, 2019 in the House:
- Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1373).
On June 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-24-19 (Gov. Msg. No. 1202)
On June 24, 2019 in the House:
- Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1202)
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 20; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella, Kim . 5 No(es): Senator(s) Harimoto, Ihara, Moriwaki, Riviere, L. Thielen. 0 Excused: none.
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Har voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Eli, Onishi, Perruso voting no (3) and none excused (0).
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 48) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 48).
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Nishimoto, Hashimoto, Ohno, Tarnas, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-19 3:30PM in conference room 329.
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-19 1:15PM in conference room 329.
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 909).
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-18-19 2:00PM in conference room 329.
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Kanuha Co-Chair; Fevella.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Hashimoto, Ohno, Tarnas, Okimoto.
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 729) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella, Riviere, Ruderman. Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Harimoto, Ihara, Moriwaki). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-09-19.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1981) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Moriwaki, Riviere, Fevella ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Harimoto; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Inouye.
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-05-19 10:15AM in conference room 211.
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1485) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Fevella.
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 03-20-19 2:45PM in conference room 229.
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-19 2:45PM in conference room 229.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 173).
- Passed First Reading.
- Referred to EDU, WAM.
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1095), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-26-19 12:30PM in House conference room 308.
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
- Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 730) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Quinlan, Tarnas, Tokioka, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Thursday, 02-14-19 2:35PM in House conference room 309.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor