+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- The committee(s) on IAC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Wednesday, 02-01-17 9:00AM in House conference room 429.
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
- Pass First Reading
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor