+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- The committee(s) on TOU recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by TOU on Wednesday, 02-18-15 9:30AM in House conference room 312.
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TOU, FIN, referral sheet 1
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.