+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (49)
On July 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Act 144, 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1246).
On July 1, 2019 in the House:
- Act 144, on 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1246).
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
- Transmitted to Governor.
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Kong, Tokioka voting no (4) and none excused (0).
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 119) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, L. Thielen, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye.
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 119).
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 12:15PM in conference room 224.
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 4:36PM in conference room 224.
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-24-19 4:36PM in conference room 224.
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 950).
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; L. Thielen, Kanuha Co-Chairs; Inouye, Fevella.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Lowen, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Wildberger, Thielen.
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 727) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Inouye.
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2048) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-05-19 10:15AM in conference room 211.
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from EET/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1399) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Baker, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 03-19-19 2:55PM in conference room 225.
- The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Fevella.
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EET/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-19 2:50PM in conference room 414.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to EET/GVO, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 172).
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1054), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-28-19 2:05PM in House conference room 308.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4).
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Deferred one day 02-13-19.
- Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 303) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen.
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-05-19 8:45AM in House conference room 325.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor