+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Har, McDermott excused (3).
- Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 200) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Kobayashi, Cabanilla, Jordan, Morikawa, Woodson, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti.
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 01-29-13 10:00AM in House conference room 329.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to HUS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.