+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 02-11-13 10:00AM in House conference room 309.
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to TRN, CPC, referral sheet 1
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor