+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (41)
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- House Conferee(s) discharged.
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 1).
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferee(s) discharged.
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 4:45PM in conference room 309.
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 2:30PM in conference room 309.
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 11:00AM in conference room 325.
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-17 1:30PM in conference room 325.
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-26-17 1:45PM in conference room 325.
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-20-17 1:45PM in conference room 325.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680).
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Tokuda Co-Chair; K. Rhoads.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586).
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585).
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Luke Co-Chairs; Holt, Matsumoto.
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 544) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1584) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
- One Day Notice 04-11-17.
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Inouye, K. Kahele, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Harimoto, Riviere ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-31-17 9:30AM in conference room 211.
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1146) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-17 9:30AM in conference room 016.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL, WAM.
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 20).
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong, Tupola, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 784), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, LoPresti, Lowen, Quinlan, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola, Kobayashi, Nakamura, Ward; 1 Noes: Representative(s) DeCoite; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Choy, Tokioka, Tupola.
On February 18, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-22-17 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 699) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakashima, Takumi, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-14-17 8:30AM in House conference room 309.
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 1
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor