+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (37)
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 41).
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- House Conferee(s) discharged.
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- The conference committee deferred the measure.
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-24-13 1:15PM in conference room 329.
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 697).
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees appointed: Green, Chair; Hee, Co-Chair(s); Nishihara.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697).
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Re-referred to EDN, HLT, LAB, referral sheet 53
- House conferees appointed: Takumi, Belatti, Nakashima Co-Chairs; Ohno, Fukumoto.
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650).
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 599) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ige, Ihara, L. Thielen . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-13.
- Floor amendment adopted as amended (SD 2).
- Floor Amendment No. 12 offered.
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from HTH/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1292) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13.
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none.
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Gabbard, Slom; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-03-13 1:30PM in conference room 229.
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to HTH/JDL.
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to HTH/EDU, WAM.
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to HTH/EDU.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 212).
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, Har, Hashem, Ito, McDermott voting no (5) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, McDermott voting no (2) and Representative(s) Coffman, Hanohano, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takumi excused (5).
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Deferred one day Friday, 03-01-13.
- Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 707) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Aquino, Choy, Nakashima, Takai, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Fale; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano, Ichiyama.
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 02-13-13 2:00PM in House conference room 309.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to EDN, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.