+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (50)
On July 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Act 215, 6/27/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1318).
On July 2, 2013 in the House:
- Act 215, on 6/27/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1318).
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761).
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755).
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 71).
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 71) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, McKelvey, Cabanilla, Cachola, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Baker, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Slom.
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-13 4:00PM in conference room 229.
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-22-13 4:00PM in conference room 229.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-19-13 11:00AM in conference room 229.
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 697).
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees appointed: Chun Oakland, Chair; Green, Baker, Co-Chair(s); Kidani, Slom.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697).
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Carroll, McKelvey Co-Chairs; Cabanilla, Cachola, Woodson, McDermott.
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650).
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 490) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1363) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13.
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Wakai.
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 04-03-13 10:00AM in conference room 229.
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 03-28-13 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
- Reported from HMS/HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 931) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN.
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Chun Oakland, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker.
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Taniguchi.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-13 2:05PM in conference room 229.
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS/HTH, CPN.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 211).
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 836), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Cabanilla, Cachola, Evans, Ito, C. Lee, Tsuji, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Carroll, Har, McDermott.
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision-making on Monday, 02-25-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-13.
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-20-13 3:00PM in House conference room 325.
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Coffman, Takai excused (4).
- Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 311) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Kobayashi, Cabanilla, Jordan, Morikawa, Woodson, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti.
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 01-29-13 10:00AM in House conference room 329.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to HUS, CPC, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.