+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 319) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, Hashem, Quinlan, San Buenaventura, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino.
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-07-17 11:15AM in conference room 423.
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 01-31-17 9:30AM in House conference room 423.
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to HSG, JUD, referral sheet 2
- Pass First Reading
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor