+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 27, 2023 in the House:
- The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 24, 2023 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-27-23 10:00AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
On February 8, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 172) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
On February 1, 2023 in the House:
- The committee on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Holt, Lamosao, Hussey-Burdick, Kong, Nakamura, Quinlan; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Pierick; and Excused: none.
On January 30, 2023 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 02-01-23 10:00AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
On January 25, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 1
On January 23, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 20, 2023 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor