+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL, WAM.
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 90).
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 943), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, Gates, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Holt, Tupola.
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-01-17 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Oshiro excused (2).
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 356) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Kong, Cullen, Evans, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Lowen, Say, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Wednesday, 02-08-17 9:00AM in House conference room 325.
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 2
- Pass First Reading
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor