+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 3, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 28) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Amato, Nakashima excused (2).
On January 31, 2023 in the House:
- The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Holt, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On January 27, 2023 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 01-31-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
On January 25, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
On January 20, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 19, 2023 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor