+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 229) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura.
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 02-07-19 8:30AM in House conference room 329. Copy of proposed draft available at www.capitol.hawaii.gov.
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 01-31-19 9:30AM in House conference room 329.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor