+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (40)
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 1:15PM in conference room 312.
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 2:00PM in conference room 312.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-13 2:00PM in conference room 312.
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-13 1:30PM in conference room 312.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709).
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator(s) Kidani replaced Senator(s) Ige as (Co-) Chair(s).
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 695).
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees appointed: Galuteria, Chair; Solomon, Ige, Co-Chair(s); Keith-Agaran, Slom.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697).
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: C. Lee, Lowen Co-Chairs; Woodson, Thielen.
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650).
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 487) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1264) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Kouchi.
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-27-13 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from THA/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 982) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-25-13 9:15AM in conference room 211.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on THA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in THA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Galuteria, Kahele, Kidani, Shimabukuro, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Hee, Slom.
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Shimabukuro, Dela Cruz, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Slom.
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on THA/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-13 1:15PM in conference room 225.
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to THA/WTL, WAM.
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 86).
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 688), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-25-13 3:30PM in House conference room 308.
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, Tokioka excused (2).
- Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 444) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Thielen, Cullen, Evans, Hanohano, Kawakami, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Coffman.
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-12-13 8:30AM in conference room 325.
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-12-13.
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-07-13 9:00AM in House conference room 325.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.