+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 178).
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-15.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 816) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-27-15 1:30PM in House conference room 308.
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Takumi excused (1).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 192) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Kawakami, Nakashima.
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-05-15 2:00PM in conference room 325.
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-15.
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 01-30-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor