+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH, JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 172).
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ohno voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-16.
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 994-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, C. Lee, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kawakami; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, McDermott.
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 01-21-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 450) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Har, Hashem, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami.
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-18-15 2:00PM in conference room 325.
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-18-15.
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-09-15 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-09-15.
- Re-referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 8
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-04-15 2:45PM in House conference room 325.
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, referral sheet 1
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor