+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-13-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-19.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-08-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-19.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-06-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-06-19.
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-05-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor