+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 02-14-13 at 2:00 pm in conference room 325.
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-14-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Har excused (2).
- Reported from LMG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 180) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on LMG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Mizuno, Awana, Cachola, Saiki, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey.
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LMG on Friday, 02-01-13 2:00PM in House conference room 423.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to LMG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.