+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On September 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 075, 09/15/2020, (Gov. Msg. No. 1185).
On September 16, 2020 in the House:
- Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 075, 09/15/2020, (Gov. Msg. No. 1185).
On July 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 380).
On July 2, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
- Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
- House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
On July 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 377).
On July 1, 2020 in the House:
- Reconsideration of action taken on 03-06-20.
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 354).
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 525) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Inouye, Ruderman . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) S. Chang, Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-20.
- Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3399) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 02-04-20 10:00AM in conference room 016.
On January 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 01-28-20 10:15AM in conference room 016.
On December 1, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1363) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Baker, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 03-14-19 2:50PM in conference room 225.
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-19 2:45PM in conference room 225.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to GVO, JDC.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 371).
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong, Say, Tokioka voting no (3) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 957) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1).
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Thielen.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-08-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-19.
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-01-19 2:01PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-01-19.
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 01-31-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to JUD , referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor