+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDC.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 6).
On February 12, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Kong, Okimoto, Onishi, Tokioka voting no (6) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Lowen excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Deferred one day 02-12-21.
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Deferred one day 02-11-21.
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 62) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-02-21 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor