+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (43)
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Act 127, 06/19/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1227).
On June 23, 2015 in the House:
- Act 127, on 06/19/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1227).
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 646).
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
- Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Deferred one day 04-28-15.
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 633).
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Reconsideration of action taken on 04-09-15.
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Green Chair; Baker Co-Chair; Slom.
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641).
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 363).
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 427) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-08-15.
- Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1333) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kahele, Kidani, Nishihara, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom.
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 04-01-15 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
- Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1032) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN.
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Gabbard, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai.
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-15 1:30PM in conference room 414.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to HTH, CPN.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 177).
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Jordan, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-15.
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 748) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Brower, Creagan, Har, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Nakashima, Yamane, McDermott.
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-02-15.
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-02-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-25-15 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-15.
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-23-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Matsumoto excused (2).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 53) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-04-15 9:00AM in House conference room 329.
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 1
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.