+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (48)
On June 24, 2021 in the House:
- Act 058, on 06/23/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1159).
On June 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Act 058, 06/23/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1159).
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 635).
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 632).
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Reconsideration of action taken on 04-15-21.
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Ichiyama, Tam, LoPresti; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-22-21 2:40PM in conference room CR 329.
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-21-21 2:40PM in conference room CR 329.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560).
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 558).
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 807).
- House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Ichiyama, Tam Co-Chairs; LoPresti, Ward.
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: San Buenaventura Chair; Keohokalole, Rhoads, English Co-Chairs; Acasio.
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 672) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-13-21.
- Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1647) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki.
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-06-21 9:55AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
- Reported from HMS/HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1264) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki.
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS/HTH has rescheduled its public hearing to 03-22-21 1:15PM; Via Videoconference.
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-21 1:05PM; Via Videoconference.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS/HTH, JDC/WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 214).
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Sayama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 904), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-02-21 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
- Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 589) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, McKelvey, Nakamura, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Takumi.
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-17-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
On February 12, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).
- Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 235) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti.
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Thursday, 02-11-21 9:30AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to HHH, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor