+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 02-14-13 9:30AM in House conference room 329.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to HUS, JUD, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor