+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision-making on Monday, 02-25-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-13.
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-20-13 3:00PM in House conference room 325.
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 02-11-13 3:30PM in conference room 325.
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-11-13 3:30PM in House conference room 325.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor