+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDC/WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 115).
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 796), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto.
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-26-21 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
- Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 560) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, McKelvey, Nakamura, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Takumi.
On February 12, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-17-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor