+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1439) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 1:20PM in conference room 225.
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to HOU, WAM.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to HOU/EET, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 162).
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1087), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto.
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-26-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
- Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 676) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura.
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Bill re-scheduled to be heard by HSH on Thursday, 02-14-19 9:00AM in conference room 329.
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HSH on Thursday, 02-14-19 8:30AM in House conference room 312.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor