+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on VMI recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 01-30-13 8:30AM in House conference room 312.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to VMI, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.