+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (41)
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 5:00PM in Conference Room 325.
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-13 1:00PM in conference room 325.
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday, 04-25-13 at 5:00 PM in Conference Room 325.
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-13 1:00PM in conference room 325.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-22-13 1:00PM in conference room 325.
- Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709).
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator(s) Kouchi discharged as conferee(s); Added as Co-Chair(s).
- Senator(s) Ige discharged as (Co-) Chair; Added as conferee.
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-18-13 4:00PM in conference room 325.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697).
- Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Gabbard, Ihara, Kouchi.
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 695).
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Rhoads, Ing Co-Chairs; Belatti, C. Lee, Thielen.
- Re-referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 53
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650).
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 484) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1362) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Kouchi.
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-27-13 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-25-13 9:20AM in conference room 211.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1012) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Gabbard, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-13 10:05AM in conference room 16.
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 200).
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Cheape, Fale, Fukumoto, Har, Ichiyama, Kawakami, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka, Tsuji, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Coffman voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Cheape, Fale, Johanson, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Coffman, Hanohano, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takumi excused (5).
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Deferred one day Friday, 03-01-13.
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 725) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Belatti, Brower, Cabanilla, Carroll, Kawakami, C. Lee, Tsuji, Wooley; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McDermott, Thielen; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ito.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-26-13 2:00PM in conference room 325.
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-26-13 at 2:00pm.
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-21-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.