+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On June 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received notice of discharge of all House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 363).
On June 22, 2020 in the House:
- Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 535).
On June 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferee(s) discharged.
On June 19, 2020 in the House:
- House Conferee(s) discharged.
On December 1, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-25-19 3:05PM in conference room 329.
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 953).
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Kanuha Co-Chair; Fevella.
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Matayoshi Co-Chairs; Hashimoto, Tarnas, Okimoto.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 718) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2038) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele.
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-19 10:20AM in conference room 211.
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1455) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Fevella.
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 03-20-19 2:45PM in conference room 229.
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-19 2:45PM in conference room 229.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDU, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 158).
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1093), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-26-19 12:30PM in House conference room 308.
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
- Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 642) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Quinlan, Tarnas, Tokioka, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Thursday, 02-14-19 2:35PM in House conference room 309.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor