+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Re-referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 22
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LMG with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Har, McDermott excused (3).
- Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 219) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LMG.
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Aquino, Choy, Ichiyama, Nakashima, Takai, Cheape, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano.
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-06-13 2:10PM in conference room 309.
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-06-13.
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 01-30-13 2:00PM in House conference room 309.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to EDN, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor