+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (41)
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommitted to Conference Committee.
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761).
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Deferred until 05-02-13.
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Aquino, Cabanilla, Cachola, Cullen, Fale, Fukumoto, Ing, Kawakami, Ward, Yamane voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Carroll, Cheape, Hanohano, Jordan, McKelvey, Oshiro, Tokioka voting no (7) and none excused (0).
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 56) as amended in (CD 1).
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti, Brower, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13.
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 56).
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13.
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-13 1:00PM in conference room 325.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-22-13 1:00PM in conference room 325.
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-18-13 4:00PM in conference room 325.
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 697).
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Shimabukuro, Co-Chair(s); Slom.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697).
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Rhoads Chair; Belatti, Brower, McDermott.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 385).
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 409) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-27-13.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1050) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Gabbard ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Slom.
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 03-19-13 10:00AM in conference room 016.
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-13 10:00AM in conference room 016.
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 161).
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Cachola, Cheape, Fale, Jordan, Takayama, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Evans, Hanohano, Kawakami, McKelvey, Oshiro, Takumi, Thielen voting no (9) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Evans, Har, McKelvey voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Fale, Kawakami, Oshiro, Thielen voting no (6) and Representative(s) Coffman, Hanohano, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takumi excused (5).
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Deferred one day Friday, 03-01-13.
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 715) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Ito, Kawakami, C. Lee, Tsuji, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Brower, Cabanilla, Carroll, Wooley.
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 01-31-13 2:00PM in conference room 325.
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 01-31-13.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 01-25-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, referral sheet 1
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor