+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (41)
On July 11, 2017 in the House:
- Act 112, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1213).
On July 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Act 112, 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1213).
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642).
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737).
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday, 04-27-17 at 4:00PM in Conference Room 325.
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 2 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Oshiro; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Kim, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 74) as amended in (CD 1).
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17.
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 74).
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17.
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-17 10:30AM in conference room 325.
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-26-17 2:00PM in conference room 325.
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-25-17 10:00AM in conference room 325.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680).
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Kim, K. Rhoads.
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Nishimoto Chair; Oshiro, McDermott.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585).
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586).
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 557) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-17.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1495) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-04-17 9:30AM in conference room 016.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 10).
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti excused (1).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 234) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Oshiro, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-03-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, referral sheet 2
- Pass First Reading
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor