+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Coffman, Takai excused (4).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 327) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Brower, Cabanilla, Ito, Kawakami, C. Lee, Tsuji, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Carroll, Wooley.
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 01-31-13 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor