+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to EET, CPH.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 157).
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1053), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-27-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Re-referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 20
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Say, Thielen, Tokioka excused (4).
- Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 34) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen.
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 01-29-19 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.