+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (46)
On July 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Vetoed on 07-09-19 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1371).
On July 9, 2019 in the House:
- Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1371).
On June 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-24-19 (Gov. Msg. No. 1202)
On June 24, 2019 in the House:
- Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1202)
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Harimoto. 0 Excused: none.
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, DeCoite, Har, Hashem, Kong, Matsumoto, Okimoto, Say, Tokioka, Ward, Yamane voting no (12) and none excused (0).
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino.
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 55) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 55).
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 11:00AM in conference room 229.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-19 10:15AM in conference room 229.
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 919).
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; K. Rhoads Co-Chair; Fevella.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee Chair; Aquino, Takayama, Thielen.
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 714) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
- Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1939) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim.
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-29-19 9:30AM in conference room 016.
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1302) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, L. Thielen, Fevella.
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
- Re-Referred to CPH, JDC.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 362).
- Passed First Reading.
- Referred to PSM, JDC.
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Har voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 942) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Thielen.
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-08-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-19.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-07-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.