+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HTH/HEA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1047) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Wakai, Baker, Gabbard, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Slom.
- The committee(s) on HEA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HEA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Inouye, Gabbard, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele, Kidani, Slom.
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH/HEA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-15 1:45PM in conference room 414.
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to HTH/HEA, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 41).
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 680), recommending passage on Third Reading.
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-03-15 1:30PM in House conference room 308.
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro excused (1).
- Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 245) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Kong, LoPresti, Ohno, Say, Takumi, Tsuji, Matsumoto, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing.
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 02-03-15 2:00PM in House conference room 309.
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 1
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor