+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 929) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Taniguchi.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-13 1:00PM in conference room 016.
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 199).
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 790) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice 03-05-13.
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-13 1:30PM in House conference room 308.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1).
- Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 13) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Woodson, Belatti, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll.
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Monday, 01-28-13 8:45AM in House conference room 329.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor