+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Monday, 02-08-16 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Re-referred to HSG, AGR, FIN, referral sheet 8
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to HUS, AGR, FIN, referral sheet 5
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor